COCOON - CARE AFTER CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support care-experienced young people who were in local authority care in or live/study/work in the London Boroughs of Richmond, Kingston, and Hounslow. We offer practical and financial support to improve living conditions, achieve aspirations, and reduce feelings of isolation at a critical life stage; support that may not be available elsewhere. We also provide an annual Christmas Day event.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 13 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Alexander Turk | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Eyre | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Anthony Hoyle | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Aghogho Akpogheneta | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
WHITNEY ELIZABETH CLARK | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
FLORIDA YACOB | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ZOE ANN SARGENT | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
EWEN MITCHELL | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.12k | £108.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.73k | £82.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO AND RELIEVE THE HARDSHIP OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE, OR HAVE BEEN, IN LOCAL AUTHORITY CARE, PARTICULARLY IN THE SOUTHEAST OF ENGLAND, AND ESPECIALLY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES, INCLUDING BY MEANS OF GRANTS OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, ADVICE, GUIDANCE, AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE, AND THE ORGANISATION OF AN ANNUAL CHRISTMAS DAY EVENT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oriel House
26 The Quadrant
Richmond
TW9 1DL
- Phone:
- 07444 767 732
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window