EASINGTON YOUTH CLUB CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of Buildings, Land and Play facilities. Provide opportunities for young people to meet, socialise, participate in recreational activitieis in a safe and friendly environment Informal learning opportunity and a facility for young people to chill out in a relaxed environment To promote and inspire personal development through life skills with the Duke of Edinburgh Award Sc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 November 2021: CIO registration
- 29 November 2021: Funds received from 523232 EASINGTON YOUTH CLUB
- EASINGTON YOUTH CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Louise Jacobs | Chair | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Margaret Hollingworth | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Brown | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Malcolm Douglas | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2022 | 04/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.88k | £21.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.85k | £11.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 November 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 November 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN EASINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Youth Club
Beck Lane
Easington
HULL
HU12 0TX
- Phone:
- 07854968524
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window