THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY EAST MOLESEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,046 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 January 2022: Standard registration
- 18 January 2023: Funds received from 1181733 ST MARY'S EAST MOLESEY CHARITABLE TRUST
- ST MARY'S EAST MOLESEY PCC (Working name)
- ST MARY?S EAST MOLESEY PCC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev NATHANIEL WILLIAM KURZ | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Gledhill | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Santos | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Herbert | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vivian White | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Vittachi | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Kurz | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Blair | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|||||
ANDREW JOHN SAUL | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
HUGH GORDON JAGGER | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DIANE SIMMS | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.35k | £209.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.22k | £224.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £625 | £4.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Marys Church
St Marys Road
East Molesey
Surrey
KT8 0ST
- Phone:
- 02084023129
- Email:
- church.office@smem.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window