Financial history ABANDONED ANIMALS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 518901
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £116.85k £172.71k £165.66k £396.03k £73.01k
Total expenditure £146.57k £154.13k £172.76k £196.09k £201.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.00k