URBAN CITY MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion mainly, but not exclusively, by means of broadcasting Christian messages of an evangelistic and teaching nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 04 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Jesuthasan | Chair | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Uma Jesuthasan | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER BOATENG | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Uduak Jesuthasan | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 April 2025 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 April 2025 | 425 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
“THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
213 MORLAND ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 6HE
- Phone:
- 07476707004
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window