NORTH YORKSHIRE HOSPICE CARE

Charity number: 518905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

North Yorkshire Hospice Care provides a range of services operating as Herriot Hospice Homecare, Saint Michael's Hospice, Just 'B' and Talking Spaces. These services provide a range of end-of-life care services including an In-Patient Unit, Wellbeing, Community and Specialist services; Bereavement Services for adults and children and Mental Health Support Services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 1987: Standard registration
  • 22 December 2021: Funds received from 1009646 THE MARIGOLD WELLBEING CENTRE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HARROGATE DISTRICT HOSPICE CARE (Working name)
  • Herriot Hospice Homecare (Working name)
  • Just 'B' (Working name)
  • SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPICE (Working name)
  • HARROGATE DISTRICT HOSPICE CARE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Wren Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Andy Makin Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
Catherine Rustomji Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Becky Fitzpatrick Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Clare Hedges Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Tim Milburn Trustee 19 October 2023
None on record
Professor Brendan Gough Trustee 18 January 2022
HERRIOT HOSPICE HOMECARE
Received: On time
JUST B BEREAVEMENT AND MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT
Recently registered
Joanne Crewe Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.18m £7.15m £7.68m £7.21m £7.99m
Total expenditure £6.50m £6.33m £6.73m £8.01m £8.43m
Income from government contracts £1.38m N/A £1.70m £513.30k £401.27k
Income from government grants N/A £1.33m £722.29k £735.29k £759.72k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.20m £4.52m £3.59m £2.43m £3.14m
Income - Other trading activities £2.39m £913.59k £2.10m £2.32m £2.45m
Income - Charitable activities £1.54m £1.49m £1.70m £2.33m £2.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.36k £13.99k £13.42k £16.77k £17.43k
Income - Other £25.25k £217.12k £277.41k £105.44k £214.60k
Income - Legacies £484.31k £310.14k £586.51k £512.97k £1.32m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.20m £4.23m £4.40m £5.39m £6.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.31m £2.10m £2.33m £2.62m £2.32m
Expenditure - Governance £6.35k £0 £0 £20.90k £27.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £3.35m £3.31m £3.62m £3.89m £5.61m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.21m £3.16m £3.68m £2.67m £2.20m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £740.20k £832.35k £712.77k £784.31k £2.48m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CRIMPLE HOUSE
HORNBEAM PARK AVENUE
HARROGATE
HG2 8NA
Phone:
01423878181