RUN KIDS RUN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run Kids Run is a social impact charitable initiative to get children and their parents fit, bring their communities together and raise vital funds for their schools. Through the organisation of fun run events in communities across the UK, Run Kids Run connects local corporate investors and private donors with the schools in communities in which they operate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
160 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Patricia Bohill | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jacobs | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lewis | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Michael Pilkington | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Versteeg | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Laura Anne Coleman Ms | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lilian Cecilia LILJA | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
PALOMA BELAUNDE | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.27k | £201.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.77k | £198.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, SERVICES AND ADVICE TO PRIMARY SCHOOLS AND THEIR PTA CHARITIES REGARDING THE ORGANISATION OF COMMUNITY SPORTS FUNDRAISING INITIATIVES. 2) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ORGANISED RUNNING EVENTS FOR PRIMARY SCHOOL CHILDREN, THEIR PARENTS/CARERS AND FRIENDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Run Kids Run
4th Floor
Kent House
14 - 17 Market Place
London
- Phone:
- 02072911170
- Email:
- contact@runkidsrun.org
- Website:
-
runkidsrun.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window