CHATTERIS U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We cater to the social and educational needs of semi-retired and retired people of any age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 30 November 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Richard Saunderson | Trustee | 16 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Terence Paul Hayward | Trustee | 16 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ceridwen Dyfed Kennedy | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joycelyn Elizabeth Cogger | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Veronica Hopper | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Leeson | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriele Margot Leeson | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Michael Robson | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Wendy Plumb | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Irene Gibbs | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Philip Windsor | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.47k | £6.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.11k | £7.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE IN THEIR THIRD AGE (BEING THE PERIOD OF TIME AFTER THE FIRST AGE OF CHILDHOOD DEPENDENCE AND THE SECOND AGE OF FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT AND/OR PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY) RESIDING IN CHATTERIS AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Bevills Close
Doddington
MARCH
Cambridgeshire
PE15 0TT
- Phone:
- 07873537717
- Email:
- u3achatteris@gmail.com
- Website:
-
u3asites.org.uk/chatteris/home
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window