Trustees CHATTERIS U3A

Charity number: 1196841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Richard Saunderson Trustee 16 May 2025
None on record
Terence Paul Hayward Trustee 16 May 2025
None on record
Ceridwen Dyfed Kennedy Trustee 23 March 2024
None on record
Joycelyn Elizabeth Cogger Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Caroline Veronica Hopper Trustee 21 April 2023
None on record
Peter James Leeson Trustee 21 April 2023
None on record
Gabriele Margot Leeson Trustee 21 April 2023
None on record
Kenneth Michael Robson Trustee 16 April 2021
None on record
Georgina Wendy Plumb Trustee 16 April 2021
None on record
Lesley Irene Gibbs Trustee 16 April 2021
None on record
Brian Philip Windsor Trustee 16 April 2021
None on record