BOMERE HEATH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity provides premises in the form of a Village Hall to enable local residents within the district to use the facilities for the primary objective of recreation and social interaction. Local clubs and groups hold meetings and rooms are available for hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £34,241 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 11 June 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennie Cooper | Chair | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Reginald TIDY | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Hollingsworth | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Cooper | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Evans | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN MISSLEBROOK | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.14k | £13.72k | £6.85k | £16.47k | £61.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.13k | £3.71k | £6.96k | £11.79k | £64.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.50k | N/A | N/A | £34.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 1930 as amended on 13 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE PREMISES HEREBY GRANTED AND CONVEYED AND ANY BUILDINGS TO BE ERECTED THEREON UPON TRUST TO PERMIT THE SAME TO BE USED AS A NON-SECTARIAN PLACE OF RECREATION AND SOCIAL INTERCOURSE UNDER THE NAME OF THE BOMERE HEATH VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE DISTRICT COMPRISING LEATON BOMERE HEATH AND PRESTON GUBBALS IN THE PARISHED OF LEATON (ST ALKMUND) AND PRESTON GUBBALS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS SUBJECT TO THE PROVISION OF THESE PRESENT BUT SO THAT THE PREMISES SHALL ON NO ACCOUNT BE USED FOR RELIGIOUS SERVICES OR PURPOSES BUT SHALL BE AVAILABLE FOR POLITICAL MEETINGS OF ALL KINDS EXCEPT MEETINGS OF A COMMUNIST OR BOLSHEVIK CHARACTER AND GAMBLING AND BETTING THEREON SHALL BE STRICTLY PROHIBITED.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bomere Heath Village Hall
Shrewsbury Road
Bomere Heath
Shrewsbury
Shropshire
SY4 3PD
- Phone:
- 07543413270
- Email:
- chair@bhvh.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window