Trustees THE WILTSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity Number: 1197142

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Mary Lawer | Chair | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Watson | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Julia Rose Kirkland | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Julie Elizabeth Roberts | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shauna Bodman | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Irene Hosking | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Mary Chapman | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ann Loosmore | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Vanessa Gibson-Piggott | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Susan Holdway | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.