EAST PECKHAM HISTORY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust aims to advance education by promoting the appreciation of the history of and encouraging further study or enquiry, into the ancient village of East Peckham in Kent, and surrounding areas, by acquiring documents and artefacts, related to the area, and making these available to the public in various ways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 21 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Neil Bodle | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gary Trevor Martin | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Anthony Carr | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
SHARON GRANT OBE | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
David Brian Seal | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.21k | £2.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £864 | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
OBJECTS OF THE EAST PECKHAM HISTORY TRUST: THE OBJECT OF THE EAST PECKHAM HISTORY TRUST FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROMOTING THE APPRECIATION OF THE HISTORY OF AND ENCOURAGING FURTHER STUDY OR ENQUIRY INTO THE HISTORY OF, THE ANCIENT VILLAGE OF EAST PECKHAM IN KENT, AND SURROUNDING AREAS (?THE AREA?), BY BUT NOT LIMITED TO: ? ACQUIRING AND CONSERVING AN ARCHIVE OF HISTORICAL DOCUMENTS, ARTEFACTS AND EPHEMERA RELATED TO THE AREA, AND MAKING THESE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: O IN A LOCAL HISTORY CENTRE; AND O VIA THE USE OF DIGITAL ARCHIVING; ? ENCOURAGING FURTHER RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF THE AREA; AND ? DEVELOPING EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES TO ENABLE THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE, RESIDENTS AND VISITORS, TO APPRECIATE AND STUDY THE HISTORY OF THE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Church Lane
East Peckham
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN12 5JH
- Phone:
- 07956395612
- Email:
- onecommunity@virginmedia.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window