THE HARWOOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1197285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant making charity funding UK registered charities working to support such charitable causes as the trustees think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £198,460
Total expenditure: £192,972

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 December 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Harwood Bernard Mills Chair 23 December 2021
None on record
Alan Richard Durrant Trustee 22 December 2022
None on record
Charles Patrick Harwood Mills Trustee 23 December 2021
None on record
Harry Christopher Harwood Mills Trustee 23 December 2021
None on record
Nicholas Harwood Bertram Mills Trustee 23 December 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £103.96k £198.46k
Total expenditure £99.78k £192.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BDB Pitmans Llp
1 Bartholomew Close
LONDON
EC1A 7BL
Phone:
02077833568
Website:

No information available