KNOW YOUR WORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At Know Your Worth, we deliver an 8 week to help teenage girls to grow self-esteem and make good decisions. We train others too. The course covers emotions, relationships and consent, social media, resilience and hopes, and is designed to help girls place greater value on themselves, and expect others to do the same. Our sessions take place in secondary schools, community groups and churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Elizabeth Power | Chair | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ann Snead | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Elspeth Dolega-Ossowski | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Brown | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Roberts | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lola Miranda Chapman | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nailah-Amandla Jazz James | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE BY ALL CHARITABLE MEANS THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND TRAINING PROGRAMMES AS A MEANS OF ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Amberley Road
MACCLESFIELD
Cheshire
SK11 8LX
- Phone:
- 07513735077
- Email:
- debs@know-your-worth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window