Trustees KNOW YOUR WORTH
Charity number: 1198913

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Elizabeth Power | Chair | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ann Snead | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Elspeth Dolega-Ossowski | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Brown | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Roberts | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lola Miranda Chapman | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nailah-Amandla Jazz James | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.