SOUTH BIRMINGHAM MUSLIM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The SBMCA aims to advance the religion of Islam in South Birmingham, and the surrounding areas, for the benefit of the public, to enlighten others about the Muslim religion, as well as to allow Muslims in South Birmingham to gather in order to carry out religious devotional acts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 18 January 2022: CIO registration
- SBMCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Salaheddin Aboulgasem | Chair | 24 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Fathi Elsadig Jamil | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Keogh | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Safa Mohamed | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mostefa Abdali | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nora Nagi | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Yousif Eltom | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.38k | £24.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.44k | £17.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SOUTH BIRMINGHAM (INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE TO, THE WARDS OF BOURNVILLE AND COTTERIDGE, WEOLEY AND SELLY OAK, HARBORNE AND NORTHFIELD) AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN SOUTH BIRMINGHAM, AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE MUSLIM RELIGION, AS WELL AS TO ALLOW MUSLIMS IN SOUTH BIRMINGHAM TO GATHER IN ORDER TO CARRY OUT RELIGIOUS DEVOTIONAL ACTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER: (A) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; (B) TO ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR, OR JOIN IN ARRANGING AND PROVIDING FOR, THE HOLDING OF EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING SPORTS AND LANGUAGE PROVISIONS, CLASSES AND LECTURES; (C) TO FACILITATE THE PROVISION FOR THE OBSERVANCE OF MUSLIM FESTIVALS, CELEBRATIONS AND RELIGIOUS GATHERINGS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 LOVELL CLOSE
BIRMINGHAM
B29 4LH
- Phone:
- 07743534325
- Email:
- info.sbmca@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window