THE FELIXSTOWE HISTORY AND MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The management and provision of historical and educational information through the provision of a museum for Felixstowe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 16 November 2021: CIO registration
- 08 December 2023: Funds received from 278342 THE FELIXSTOWE HISTORY AND MUSEUM SOCIETY
- FELIXSTOWE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Marie Harkin | Chair | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Alan Malster | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mr KEVIN JOHN SULLIVAN | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jayne Lindill | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Puxley | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Harris | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Hilton | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT OF A MUSEUM IN FELIXSTOWE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Felixstowe Museum
View Point Road
FELIXSTOWE
IP11 3TW
- Phone:
- 01394674355
- Email:
- felmuseum@btopenworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window