FELINE FUR BABIES NORTH WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cat charity. Care and Rehoming of local unwanted cats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,005 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 04 February 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Williams | Chair | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Cockcroft | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Bellinger | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison Webb | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH JONES | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.58k | £101.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.36k | £102.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £10.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED ON 19 JAN 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OF OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 SOUTH AVENUE
PRESTATYN
DENBIGHSHIRE
LL19 8TH
- Phone:
- 01745853993
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window