COLNE VALLEY TREE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The members of the society plant native tree whips on selected sites, each Saturday morning from the start of November to the end of April. And woodland management in the summer months.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Kirklees
Governance
- 24 June 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP EDWARD BAXTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Geoffrey Cox | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN KENNEDY | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.55k | £2.25k | £1.88k | £4.87k | £6.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.36k | £2.20k | £2.29k | £4.43k | £1.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 March 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 1987 AS AMENDED 1 NOVEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ECOLOGICAL INDESPENSIBILITY OF TREES AND THEIR AMENITY VALUE AND TO ENCOURAGE PLANTING AND PROTECTION OF TREES IN THE COLNE VALLEY AREA (DEFINED AS AN AREA TO THE WEST OF HUDDERSFIELD WEST YORKSHIRE AND LYING BETWEEN THE COUNTY BOUNDARY AT STANDEDGE AND THE RAILWAY VIADUCT AT LONGROYD BRIDGE).
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 STATION ROAD
MARSDEN
HUDDERSFIELD
HD7 6DH
- Phone:
- 07549628421
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window