CYLCH MEITHRIN Y FELINHELI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Charity is to advance the education of preschool children in Y Felinheli through the medium of the Welsh language. This is done by: a) providing and presenting safe and satisfying play and activities b) arranging other charitable activities in order to help parents support their children, and c) promoting the aims of Mudiad Ysgol Meithrin and presenting them to parents/guardians
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £39,493 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 08 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catrin Elis Sidgwick | Chair | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Rhiannon Roberts | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Sarah Hall | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Murray Roberts | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.66k | £58.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.25k | £52.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.87k | £39.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 September 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 September 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
HYRWYDDO ADDYSG PLANT CYN-YSGOL A PHLANT CYNRADD (GAN GANOLBWYNTIO'N BENODOL AR BLANT OED CYN-YSGOL) TRWY GYFRWNG Y GYMRAEG YM MHENTREF Y FELINHELI.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CABAN
YSGOL Y FELINHELI
Y WERN
Y FELINHELI
LL56 4TZ
- Phone:
- 07735749799
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window