FORT HALSTEAD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help preserve, for the public benefit, Fort Halstead, a Victorian mobilisation centre (scheduled monument 303), and the associated apparatus, documents, films, photographs, artefacts, other associated buildings within the historic enclave. To advance the education of the public on the historical work of Fort Halstead in all areas and the impact this had on todays modern world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 08 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Wagstaff B Sc | Chair | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Ruffles | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Willard-Wright | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr GRAHAM MARTIN ROOD | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Kieselack | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £514 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PRESERVE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, FORT HALSTEAD, A VICTORIAN MOBILISATION CENTRE (SCHEDULED MONUMENT 303), AND THE ASSOCIATED APPARATUS, DOCUMENTS, FILMS, PHOTOGRAPHS, ARTEFACTS, OTHER ASSOCIATED BUILDINGS WITHIN THE HISTORIC ENCLAVE AS DEFINED BY THE FORT HALSTEAD SITE DEVELOPMENT PLAN AND ANY OTHER ITEMS CONNECTED TO FORT HALSTEAD. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE HISTORICAL WORK OF FORT HALSTEAD IN ALL AREAS AND THE IMPACT THIS HAD ON TODAYS MODERN WORLD. 3. TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC BY WORKING WITH SIMILAR ORGANISATIONS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Old Barn Road
Leybourne
WEST MALLING
Kent
ME19 5HQ
- Phone:
- 07495817716
- Email:
- trust@forthalstead.org
- Website:
-
Forthalstead.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window