THEATRE TROUPE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Theatre Troupe works with children and young people with mental health problems, transforming lives through the radical nature of participatory theatre. Through community programmes and projects in schools, health and social care settings, our specialist, research-based work is designed to reduce distress, increase self-esteem, build safe and trusting relationships, and create brighter futures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 February 2022: CIO registration
- THEATRE TROUPE CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie-Jeanne Kenji Maghoma | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Louise Bakewell | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Amy Kraftman | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Andrews | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.51k | £28.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.44k | £44.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND YOUNG ADULTS AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC CREATIVE WORKSHOPS AND OTHER RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES INCLUDING ART AND DRAMA ACTIVITIES DIRECTED TO PROMOTING THEIR SOCIAL INCLUSION, AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SKILLS, CAPABILITIES AND CONFIDENCE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF SUFFERING OR BEING AFFECTED BY MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, SOCIAL EXCLUSION, EDUCATIONAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE. 2. TO ADVANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Harbour Way
SHOREHAM-BY-SEA
West Sussex
BN43 5BX
- Phone:
- 02086927888
- Email:
- info@theatretroupe.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window