THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING

Charity number: 1198887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide assistance to Members and member's dependants where and when determined to be needed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 10 November 2023

Total income: £75,744
Total expenditure: £44,484

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Greece
  • Hong Kong
  • Jamaica
  • Nigeria
  • Scotland
  • South Africa
  • Sri Lanka

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Boad Trustee 15 October 2024
None on record
Dr Carlos Lledo Fernandez Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Dr Ross John Freeman Trustee 23 March 2023
DOCTORS' SUPPORT NETWORK
Received: On time
THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING
Received: On time
Dr Cheryl Pitt Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
JOHN KAILOFER Trustee 23 March 2023
THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING
Received: On time
Michael James Beeson Trustee 23 March 2023
THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING
Received: On time
Dr Stephen Jeremy Paterson Trustee 23 March 2023
THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING
Received: On time
Paul Howard Marsden Trustee 23 March 2023
THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING
Received: On time
JULIAN BENNETT Trustee 04 November 2022
THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING
Received: On time
Dr CHRISTOPHER CORTI Trustee 11 May 2022
THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING
Received: On time
STEPHEN DAWE Trustee 11 May 2022
THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING
Received: On time
Peter Matthew Waugh Trustee 11 May 2022
THE MEMBERS BENEVOLENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS AND MINING
Received: On time
ROYAL SCHOOL OF MINES ASSOCIATION TRUST
Received: On time
Peter James Hoddinott Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Charles Rhodes Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/11/2023
Total gross income £75.74k
Total expenditure £44.48k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 November 2023 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2023 03 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
297 EUSTON ROAD
LONDON
NW1 3AD
Phone:
02074517300
Email:
mbt@iom3.org