EMBRACE THE FUTURE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty arising from lack of financial or material resources and assistance to children from disadvantaged families in any part of Nigeria who are suffering hardship by providing school/tuition fees and materials that will enable poor children to attend school. For the relief of poverty - Payment of school, tuition and examination fees uniform & books.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nigeria
Governance
- 11 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stanley Joseph | Chair | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Joseph | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brooklyn Joseph | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Joseph | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Joseph | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG FAMILIES SUFFERING FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN NIGERIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: A) PAYMENT OF SCHOOL, TUITION AND EXAMINATION FEES. B) PAYMENT FOR SCHOOL UNIFORMS, BOOKS AND OTHER RELATED ITEMS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Myrtle Close
UXBRIDGE
Middlesex
UB8 3QB
- Phone:
- 07440211792
- Email:
- info@etff.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window