HANDSWORTH WOOD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
church meetings, youth Work, helping the needy at home and abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Leicestershire
- Sandwell
- Warwickshire
- Afghanistan
- Bhutan
- China
- Haiti
- India
- Laos
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- South Korea
- Sri Lanka
- Syria
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 23 June 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Vera Austin | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA FOWLER | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER H GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.74k | £8.09k | £8.51k | £9.35k | £9.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.69k | £5.06k | £5.36k | £8.54k | £12.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 MARCH 1987
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE UNDERWRITTEN FOURTH SCHEDULE AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORIAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE. 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OF DISTRESS OR ARE AGED OR SICK. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTINAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Hollyhedge Road
West Bromwich
B71 3BS
- Phone:
- 01215320955
- Email:
- judithgraham110547@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window