NATIONAL PUG PROTECTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the promotion,protection and preservation of animal welfare . The rescue of abandoned,neglected or abused animals . The provision of free veterinary care for rescued animals through approved veterinarian surgeons where required. Select approved,safe and experienced foster/ permanent homes to care for rescued animals. Provide experienced , safe homes for the re homing of domesticated animal
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Cunningham | Chair | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Fionda | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Callaghan | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.80k | £78.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.53k | £45.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR PUGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, REHOMING SUCH DOGS WHERE POSSIBLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
499 FOOTSCRAY ROAD
LONDON
SE9 3UH
- Phone:
- 07771776186
- Email:
- treasurer.nppt@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window