THE CHEV GATESHEAD LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides activities for those with special educational needs and/or other disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
Governance
- 15 March 2022: Standard registration
- THE CHEV (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Stern | Chair | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jeffrey Wallace | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Wacks | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.98k | £100.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.53k | £67.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION, AMONG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF A SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF HAVING SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OR DISABILITIES, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE AND ACCESSIBLE OUT OF HOURS ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
203A Coatsworth Road
GATESHEAD
Tyne And Wear
NE8 1SR
- Phone:
- 01914901818
- Email:
- cedricdesign1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window