STEEPLE ASTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Steeple Aston and the surrounding area without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for: a) meetings, lectures and classes, and b) other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 February 2022: CIO registration
- 03 April 2025: Funds received from 304377 STEEPLE ASTON VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA ANN BREWER | Chair | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Cooper | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Patricia MORAN | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET EDNA BULLEYMENT | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PRESTON | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr JOHN WHITE | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Christina Clarke | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Cummins | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Torquil Corbett Wren McClusky | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Malcolm William Coley | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Morris | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.24k | £9.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.16k | £8.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2025 | 353 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF STEEPLE ASTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 GRANGE PARK
STEEPLE ASTON
Bicester
Oxfordshire
- Phone:
- 01869347346
- Email:
- jbulleyment@waitrose.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window