THE DEVCHANDBHAI & KANKUBEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1197508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education for children

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £13,782
Total expenditure: £111,801

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Bolivia
  • Cambodia
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Laos
  • Nepal
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Peru
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KISHORILAL DEVCHAND GOSAR SHAH Chair 14 January 2022
None on record
ZAVERCHAND DEVCHAND SHAH Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record
CHAAND SAAYER SHAH Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record
SHIV SHAH Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.13m £13.78k
Total expenditure £7.26k £111.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.13m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A
Income - Investment £3.34k N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.26k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £7.26k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26 PEMBROKE ROAD
NORTHWOOD
MIDDLESEX
HA6 2HR
Phone:
07768440748
Website:

No information available