THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF PHARMACY SLEEP SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide essential information to pharmacists to improve patient access to evidence-based sleep information at the earliest possible stage and raise awareness of symptoms and the treatments available for those suffering from sleep disorders. We engage in research that accelerates access to evidence-based help for sleep disorders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 April 2022: CIO registration
- BSPSS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Evans | Chair | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raj Nutan | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Berger | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Adrian Williams FRCP | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Hill PhD | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Breege Leddy | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Grandi | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rod Tucker | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110 | £2.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90 | £640 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 16 October 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY RAISING AWARENESS OF SYMPTOMS AND THE TREATMENTS AVAILABLE FOR THOSE SUFFERING FROM SLEEP DISORDERS B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST COMMUNITY PHARMACISTS) ON THE SUBJECT OF SLEEP DISORDERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 WATERFORD LANE
CHERRY WILLINGHAM
LINCOLN
LN3 4AL
- Phone:
- 01235364121
- Email:
- hello@bspss.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window