DO SLUMTHING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial support for schools and individual past and present students in slum communities in India and elsewhere
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- India
Governance
- 13 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Rye | Chair | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Giulia Pepe | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Karen Jeffreys | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alan Boles | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Rye | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Shah Collins | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.25k | £42.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £22.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG SLUM COMMUNITIES IN INDIA AND WORLDWIDE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, GRANTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 COLLEGE ROAD
CLIFTON
BRISTOL
BS8 3HZ
- Phone:
- 07802437934
- Email:
- info@doslumthing.com
- Website:
-
doslumthing.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window