WILD TIGER HEALTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion, for the public benefit, of the conservation of free-ranging tigers in their natural habitat in particular but not exclusively by the provision and/or facilitation of veterinary services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Lewis | Chair | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Alexander Smith | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Killian Jay Currey-Lewis | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Susannah Munns | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.35k | £13.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, OF THE CONSERVATION OF FREE-RANGING TIGERS IN THEIR NATURAL HABITAT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION AND/OR FACILITATION OF VETERINARY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broomstick Cottage
179 Botley Road
Chesham
Buckinghamshire
HP5 1XR
- Phone:
- 07870626898
- Email:
- WTHC@wildlifevets.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window