Trustees THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1197247

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Joanna Margaret Jackson | Chair | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adrian Mallows | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sivaramkumar Shanmugam | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Clare Margaret Kell | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rhoda Allison | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maurice Darding | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Frances Hislop | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas William Wainwright | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Terence Garcia | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rekha Soni | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
William David Fitzgerald | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.