FARNHAM SINFONIA (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Surrey-based professional orchestra creating music for the community with concerts and outreach programmes. We work to nurture the next generation of young musical talent and to inspire and entertain everyone, regardless of personal circumstance or disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK FRANK CARPENTER | Chair | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Diana Ellen Martin | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ERNEST MARTIN | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roy Dennis Waight | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.84k | £18.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.98k | £9.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF CLASSICAL MUSIC IN FARNHAM SURREY AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF: A. LIVE CONCERTS AND RECITALS; B. LECTURES, CONFERENCES, COURSES AND MASTERCLASSES; C. VISITS TO SCHOOLS AND HOSPICES; D. AN ANNUAL GRANT TO A STUDENT FROM THE YEHUDI MENUHIN SCHOOL OF MUSIC; E. SPONSORING NEW COMPOSITIONS, AND; F. SPONSORING TRAINING AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS. 2. TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower Thicket
High Thicket Road
Dockenfield
FARNHAM
GU10 4HB
- Phone:
- 01252793271
- Website:
-
fanhamsinfonia.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window