CELEBRATION CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Celebration Church International exists to advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the entire public in the United Kingdom through the broadcasting of Christian messages and music, holding prayer meetings and much more. We currently operate physically in London, Birmingham, Manchester and Glasgow on Sundays by 11am & Wednesdays by 6pm, and stream to other parts of the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,462,500
Donations and legacies | £1.46m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,103,554
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.10m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.10m | |
Retained for future use | £358.95k |
People

5 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
550 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Peter Joseph Usikpo | Chair | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ajoke Eloviano Emekene | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Okeoghene Godswill Mba | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £701.05k | £1.46m | |
|
Total expenditure | £616.46k | £1.10m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £701.05k | £1.46m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £616.46k | £1.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.38k | £15.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £42.85k | £90.57k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £57.92k | £408.45k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £240 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.32k | £42.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN HOLY BIBLE, THROUGH: I. THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS; BROADCASTING OF CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE; AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. II. THE PROVISION PASTORAL CARE AND CARRYING OUT EVANGELISTIC AND OUTREACH WORK IN THE COMMUNITY. B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE WITHIN THE CHURCH OR THE GEOGRAPHICAL COMMUNITY IN WHICH IT OPERATES AND ANY PART WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM, THROUGH: I. PROVIDING RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO FAMILIES AND PEOPLE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT; II. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO RESIDENTS WITHIN LONDON WHO ARE VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTER BY SUPPLYING THEM WITH FOOD AND BASIC NEEDS; C) TO PROMOTE OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES ASSOCIATED WITH THE CELEBRATION CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN LONDON, UNITED KINGDOM AND ULTIMATELY WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
167-169 Great Portland Street
5th Floor
London
Unknown
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- +447380105413
- Email:
- uk@joincci.org
- Website:
-
joincci.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window