THE DRAKE AND TONSON FOUNDATION 2021

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The sole purpose of the Foundation is to support education in Keighley. This is done by making grants to schools and to individual young people under the age of 25 years. Applications should be sent to the Foundation's email address DrakeandTonson@btinternet.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bradford City
Governance
- 07 March 2022: CIO registration
- 19 October 2023: Funds received from 1060237 THE DRAKE AND TONSON FOUNDATION MAIN FUND
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joel Griffiths MA,MSc,MEd | Chair | 07 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher James Ellison | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nazia Rehman | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Lintern | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Jones BEd | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Burgin | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sehrish Juwayriyya Malik | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.35k | £12.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.12k | £11.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 May 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 May 2024 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN KEIGHLEY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUALS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO HAVE ATTENDED KEIGHLEY SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Springfield House
Knott Lane
Eastburn
KEIGHLEY
BD20 7AQ
- Phone:
- 07932798727
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window