GWENT VISUALLY HANDICAPPED BOWLING CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 14 July 1987: Standard registration
- 25 June 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £736 | £538 | |
|
Total expenditure | £819 | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 20 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 09 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1981 AMENDED 2 MARCH 1987 AND 11 JUNE 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE GAME OF BOWLS TO BE PLAYED BY VISUALLY HANDICAPPED PEOPLE IN THE TOWN OF NEWPORT GWENT AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT AND TO ENCOURAGE SUCH PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN THE GAME.
Area of benefit
NEWPORT GWENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window