THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WITH ST JOHN PENGE

Charity number: 1197262
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church of England Parish We offer church services on Sunday and midweek, and a variety of community activities including toddler groups, school visits, food banks and work with elderly and vulnerable people in the community. We also conduct baptisms, weddings and funerals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £196,775
Total expenditure: £192,132

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley
  • Croydon
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 December 2021: Standard registration
  • 11 January 2022: Funds received from 1153196 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
  • 14 January 2022: Funds received from 1181748 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jessica Clare Smith Chair 11 October 2021
None on record
Marggie Gomba Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Rev Raymond Shergill Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Frances Braithwaite Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Richard John Thomson Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Rebecca Jane Short Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Dr Terry John Wright Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Hazel Ann Willson Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Tamara Justine Cooper Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Russell James JONES Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Julian Providence Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Suzanne Thomson Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Ruth Isabel Wright Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Oladunni Oluwakemi Ogundipe Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Peter Robert John Carter Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Jessica Jacinta Moscrop Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Ian William Baldwin Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Dr Andrew Rhys Griffiths Trustee 08 September 2021
OASIS AQUILA HOUSING
Received: On time
JANICE BARBARA BESSANT Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £226.15k £196.78k
Total expenditure £183.75k £192.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 November 2024 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 November 2024 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 February 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 February 2024 118 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH
66 LENNARD ROAD
LONDON
SE20 7LX
Phone:
02087787258