CYLCH MEITHRIN LLANILLTUD FAWR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nursery providing care and education in the medium of Welsh to two to four year olds in the area of Llantwit Major.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £60,939 from 43 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 11 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Mary Clark | Chair | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Baxter-Jones | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mair Anne Fitzpatrick Heaton | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.70k | £159.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.27k | £142.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.09k | £60.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF, PRE-SCHOOL AND PRIMARY AGED CHILDREN (WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON PRE-SCHOOL AGED CHILDREN) THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN LLANTWIT MAJOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MEITHRIN
YSGOL DEWI SANT
HAM LANE EAST
LLANTWIT MAJOR
CF61 1TQ
- Phone:
- 01446792233
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window