Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN, PRESTON

Charity number: 1196971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Barbara Jayne Hunter Chair 04 July 2021
None on record
Anthony Malcolm Riley Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Hannatu Mshelia Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Hannah Kathryn Falkingham Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Peter Gaskell Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Louise Gemma Harlow Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Fiona Elizabeth Duncan Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
David Patrick Rankin Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Hannah Louise Gaskell Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Melanie Jane Hollaway Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
Dr Andrew Hirons Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
Andrew Robert Pratt Trustee 01 May 2015
ACT (ACTION FOR THE COMMUNITY AND TOWN) AT THE CHEETHAMS LIMITED
Received: On time
Sarah Grace Woolford Trustee 16 May 2011
None on record
Stephanie Mary Rankin Trustee 30 April 1987
None on record
Patricia Anne Pinder Trustee 30 April 1978
None on record