KHAYRAAT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty in Kenya by providing grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Kenya
Governance
- 03 March 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hamza Habib | Chair | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED ABANUR | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Aisha Abu | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rufeida Alhatimy | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/03/2023 | 20/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.80k | £20.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.27k | £19.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
“THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN KENYA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY”.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 4193
321-323 High Road
Chadwell Heath
RM6 6AX
- Phone:
- 07983072735
- Email:
- info@khayraat.org
- Website:
-
khayraat.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window