IOW DEFIBRILLATORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity with general charitable purposes to provide life saving defibrillators to local communities. And provide life saving CPR and the knowledge in use of Defibrillators through community awareness classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 January 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Read | Chair | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kylie Day | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Read | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Scudder | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/01/2023 | 06/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.09k | £33.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.28k | £32.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 January 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 January 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 January 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 January 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 27 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING LIVES BY REDUCING POST CARDIAC ARREST FATALITIES ON THE ISLE OF WHITE AND BEYOND, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. PROVIDING FREE OF CHARGE, PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE AED DEFIBRILLATORS 2. RAISING AWARENESS OF THE IMPORTANCE OF BASIC LIFE SUPPORT AND QUICK ACTIONS IN RESPONSE TO CARDIAC EMERGENCIES 3. PROVIDING BASIC LIFE SUPPORT TRAINING (CARDIO PULMONARY RESUSCITATION AND AED)
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 6 WESTHILL MANOR
9 WESTHILL ROAD
SHANKLIN
Isle of Wight
PO37 6PU
- Phone:
- +447894738246
- Email:
- steve@iowdefibrillators.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window