HUYTON CHURCHES TRAINING SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a training organisation for young people and adults. The aim is to educate and retrain people to help them into employment. This is through the provision of work experience and training facilities as will enable such persons to aquire and develop vocational skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
Governance
- 17 July 1987: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- H C T S (Working name)
- HUYTON CHURCHES COMMUNITY AIDS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.81m | £3.68m | £869.28k | £706.48k | £238.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £924.56k | £802.43k | £1.01m | £906.66k | £587.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.66m | £3.64m | £806.27k | £573.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £19.50k | £9.02k | £59 | £37 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £132.90k | £27.45k | £62.94k | £132.80k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | £740.32k | £943.58k | £830.26k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £50.90k | £62.11k | £65.71k | £76.41k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £873.66k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 24 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 03 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 20 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 13 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 07 November 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JANUARY 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 MAY 1989
Charitable objects
A) TO DEVELOP CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND WITNESS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY IN HUYTON NEAR LIVERPOOL IN THE COUNTY OF MERSEYSIDE. B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE NEED AMONG YOUNG AND OTHER UNEMPLOYED PERSONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE AND OF SUCH TRAINING FACILITIES AS WILL ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATION SKILLS. C) TO CARRY OUT PROJECTS AND WORKS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS ARE CHARITABLE AND FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITY IN HUYTON NEAR LIVERPOOL MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window