EGLISE LA LOUANGE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith in accordance with the statement of faith in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the trustees from time to time may think fit and to fulfil such other purposes which are exclusively charitable according to the law of England and Wales and are connected with the charitable work of the church.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothe Nandono | Chair | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Omba Kasuku | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wivine Deborah Kanyinda Kasakanga | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 259 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 259 days | |
Annual return | 11 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 625 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 625 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 HAMPDEN LANE
LONDON
N17 0AS
- Phone:
- 07424069583
- Email:
- tnandono@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window