Financial history STATHERN WAR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 519063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £16.63k £24.64k £14.97k £24.70k £23.27k
Total expenditure £9.79k £6.73k £9.20k £14.03k £19.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.68k £18.60k £2.67k N/A N/A