Trustees LONG COVID SOS

Charity Number: 1199120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Moore Chair 17 February 2025
BRITISH PREGNANCY ADVISORY SERVICE
Received: On time
Philip Sturgeon Trustee 22 January 2025
HELENA KENNEDY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Melanie Ann Cassoff Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Joanna Mary Clift Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Professor Amitava Banerjee Trustee 31 May 2022
THE BRITISH CARDIOVASCULAR SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Karen Louise Matthews Trustee 21 November 2021
None on record