Financial history ANIMAL WELFARE (FURNESS)

Charity number: 519065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £134.18k £194.00k £192.33k £0 £0
Total expenditure £97.45k £118.11k £163.52k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £45.00k £41.39k N/A N/A N/A