SOUTH WALES SHIRE HORSE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve the breed and promote the breeding of Shire Horses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Monmouthshire
- Powys
Governance
- 21 July 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALSON PHILLIPS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALAN POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER LOUISE PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.71k | £14.42k | £68.20k | £23.86k | £11.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.80k | £21.98k | £22.15k | £30.75k | £23.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL RULES. ADOPTED 21 MAY 1987
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE BREED AND PROMOTE THE BREEDING OF SHIRE HORSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 Abernant Road
Markham
BLACKWOOD
Gwent
NP12 0QJ
- Phone:
- 01495225649
- Email:
- the.secretary@swshs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window