THE LASHES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a grant making charity that help people in need within our local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 07 January 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James Sumner | Chair | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annie Lee Wilson | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Darby | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hill | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Pownall | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Wilson | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Wilson | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Wilson | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Delahunty | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/01/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.07k | £127.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.43k | £113.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 January 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 January 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST THE COMMUNITY, PARTICULARLY THE ELDERLY AND DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE IN THE CLIPSTONE PARISH AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, GOODS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF LIFE, PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, AND IMPROVE MENTAL WELL-BEING TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE CLIPSTONE PARISH AND SURROUND AREAS, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SUPPORT RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE (B) PROVIDING GRANTS TO SUPPORT ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS (C) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE PARISH OF CLIPSTONE AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITY AREAS, WHO DEMONSTRATE EXCEPTIONAL COMMITMENT AND/OR ABILITY IN ACADEMIC, SPORT, OR THE PERFORMING ARTS BUT MAY BE HELD BACK BY THEIR FINANCIAL SITUATION FROM PURSUING THEIR GOALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 CARDINAL WAY
CLIPSTONE VILLAGE
MANSFIELD
NG21 9FH
- Phone:
- 07970189710
- Email:
- hello@lashesfoundation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window