CREWE SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have services and social evenings. The church phone is always on for anyone who feels they need to speak to anyone
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 March 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Christine Robinson | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Florence Joan Sheppard | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Tunnicliffe | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £12.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.56k | £11.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADELAIDE STREET SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
4 ADELAIDE STREET
CREWE
CW1 3DT
- Phone:
- 07889480887
- Email:
- SANDRATURNBALL@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window